BURTON-IN-KENDAL EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To distribute funds from investments to young people in sixth form education and Universities and Colleges who live within the parishes of Burton-in-Kendal, Beetham and Arnside, Cumbria.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Cumbria
Governance
- 19 May 1965: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER KENNETH BINGHAM | Trustee | 11 November 2012 |
|
|||||||
Hugh Miles | Trustee | 16 May 1995 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.55k | £3.55k | £2.79k | £3.13k | £3.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.82k | £4.01k | £2.86k | £3.40k | £3.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 March 2022 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 22 AUGUST 1957
Charitable objects
9(I) BENEFIT OF PERSONS UNDER 25 YEARS OF AGE LIVING IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, WHO HAVE FOR OR NOT LESS THAN TWO YEARS ATTENDED A COUNTY OR VOLUNTARY SCHOOL BY (A) AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TENABLE AT A PLACE OF LEARNING. (B) PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE THEM ON LEAVING SCHOOL OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT TO PREPARE FOR OR, TO ASSIST THEIR ENTRY INTO A PROFESSION, TRADE OF CALLING. (C) AWARDING SCHOLARSHIPS OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO TRAVEL ABROAD TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION. (D) PROVISION OR ASSISTING THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES OF A KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE L.E.A., FOR RECREATION AND SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING OR BENEFICIARIES WHO ARE RECEIVING PRIMARY, SECONDARY OR FURTHER EDUCATION. (E) PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE THEM TO STUDY MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS. (II) PROVISION OF YEARLY SUMS OF NOT MORE THAN ú50 OUT OF THE BURTON-IN-KENDAL SHARE AND NOT MORE THAN ú20 OUT OF THE BEETHAM SHARE IN PROVIDING SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE L E A FOR COUNTY OR VOLUNTARY PRIMARY SCHOOLS IN THE ANCIENT PARISHES OF BURTON-IN-KENDAL AND BEETHAM RESPECTIVELY AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE AGREED UPON BETWEEN THE GOVERORS.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISHES OF BURTON IN KENDAL AND BEETHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 Pear Tree Park
Holme
CARNFORTH
LA6 1SD
- Phone:
- 01524784918
- Email:
- mvrob23@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window