RICHARDSON'S SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making awards to eligible students, also to Smalley Richardson Endowed School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 11 February 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WAYNE JUDSON | Chair | 15 January 2014 |
|
|||||
Tania Pells | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Anne Jane Seals | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Lauren Janine DelRosso | Trustee | 08 February 2017 |
|
|||||
PETER WHITE | Trustee |
|
||||||
MICHAEL HAYTON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.73k | £3.00k | £3.27k | £3.63k | £3.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.58k | £3.72k | £3.06k | £3.35k | £3.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 6 SEPTEMBER 1880 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES OF 8 FEBRUARY 1896, 8 NOVEMBER 1898, 23 JUNE 1932 AND 29 AUGUST 1956
Charitable objects
1. MAINTENANCE OF A VOLUNTARY PRIMARY SCHOOL 2. PROVIDING SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND FOR THE RICHARDSON ENDOWED PRIMARY SCHOOL NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY. 3. ASSISTANCE OF BOYS AND GIRLS RESIDENT IN THE FORMER TOWNSHIPS OF SMALLY HEANOR AND HORSLEY WOODHOUSE OR WHO ATTENDED THE SAID SCHOOL FOR NOT LESS THAN TWO YEARS. TO OBTAIN FURTHER EDUCATION AND RECREATION OR TO ENTER A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING.
Area of benefit
FORMER TOWNSHIPS OF SMALLEY HEANOR AND HORSLEY WOODHOUSE
Contact information
- Address:
-
88 Main Road
Smalley
Ilkeston
DE7 6DS
- Phone:
- 01332882065
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window