DERBY DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION

Charity number: 527038
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the work of Christian Education and training in the parishes of the Diocese of Derby and to enable and encourage the work of Church of England schools in the Diocese by: Maintaining and improving school buildings using EFA grants. Being an active partner in school improvement in Church schools. Increasing the quality and quantity of provision for children and young people in parishes.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £445,549
Total expenditure: £449,178

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Derby City
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 July 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • DERBY DIOCESAN COUNCIL OF EDUCATION (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Emily May Brailsford Trustee 15 March 2025
MOTHERS UNION (DIOCESE OF DERBY BRANCH)
Received: On time
Jo-Anne Emma Richardson Trustee 30 January 2025
None on record
Diane Gabrielle Fretwell Trustee 01 January 2025
None on record
Susan Jane Whyld Trustee 12 September 2024
None on record
Teresa Ann Nicholls Trustee 28 August 2024
None on record
Carol Fearria Trustee 28 August 2024
None on record
The Venerable Nicola Jane Fenton Trustee 28 August 2024
None on record
Sarah Helen Kerr Barley-McMullen Trustee 28 August 2024
None on record
The Right Reverend William Malcolm Macnaughton Trustee 28 August 2024
PETER COWLEY AFRICA TRUST
Received: On time
LOVE BURUNDI
Received: On time
THE DERBY DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LIMITED
Received: On time
Aimee Catherine Tinkler Trustee 28 August 2024
THE CHARTERED COLLEGE OF TEACHING
Received: On time
The Right Reverend Elizabeth Jane Holden Lane Trustee 28 August 2024
THE DERBY DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LIMITED
Received: On time
Rev Philip James Selby Trustee 28 August 2024
CHARITY CALLED THE POOR'S LANDS
Received: On time
SCARGILL'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
RISLEY EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MIDDLEMORE'S ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
John Payne Trustee 28 August 2024
SHEFFIELD MUSIC ACADEMY
Received: On time
Canon Christine Mary Holmes-Elener Trustee 28 August 2024
THE DERBY DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LIMITED
Received: On time
Oona Luise Gilbertson Trustee 28 August 2024
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £977.22k £482.63k £479.40k £348.45k £445.55k
Total expenditure £613.97k £507.63k £353.16k £365.67k £449.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £170.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £700.37k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £106.86k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £583.04k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £30.93k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 09 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 13 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 03 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 4 NOVEMBER 1970
Charitable objects
ADVANCEMENT AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE STUDY OF HOLY SCRIPTURES IN THE DIOCESE OF DERBY.
Area of benefit
DIOCESE OF DERBY
Registration history
  • 05 July 1963 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
DERBY DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION
DERBY CHURCH HOUSE
FULL STREET
DERBY
DE1 3DR
Phone:
01332388660