KIRK LANGLEY PRIMARY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL

Charity number: 527050
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Support adults and children who have a village link to access educational activities and opportunities within our church and school community and to provide items to enhance the well being of the church and its community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £1,128
Total expenditure: £186

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 September 1972: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL JOHN HEAP Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
GODFREY MEYNELL Trustee 12 July 2013
LEEKE MEMORIAL HALL
Received: On time
MRS MARY DEBLING Trustee 17 September 2011
None on record
MARGARET PATRICIA MATTHEWS Trustee 17 September 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £990 £1.01k £1.05k £1.09k £1.13k
Total expenditure £226 £2.65k £3.15k £178 £186
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 08 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
38 Parsons Green
Derby
DE22 4DS
Phone:
01332720544
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available