Governing document OLD SWINFORD HOSPITAL

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 16 JUNE 1954 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES OF 2 JULY 1986,26 OCT 1987, 10 JAN 1989 AND 17 DEC 1997, RESOLUTIONS OF 30 SEPT 1999 AND 13 JUNE 2000, MODIFICATION ORDER OF 5 JAN 2004, SCHEME OF 25 NOV 2004 AND RESOLUTIONS OF 1 DEC 2005 AND 24 SEPT 2009 AS AMENDED ON 15 OCT 2015 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 15 JUL 2021
Charitable objects
(A) A VOLUNTARY AIDED BOARDING AND DAY SCHOOL WITH RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION GIVEN THEREIN IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND. (B) THE AWARD OF BOARDING AWARDS AND LEAVING EXHIBITIONS FOR HIGHER EDUCATION AND PRIZE AWARDS. (C) AWARDS FOR ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE. (D) PROVIDING FOR THE SCHOOL SUCH OTHER SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.