Trustees OLD SWINFORD HOSPITAL
Charity number: 527116

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MALCOLM WILCOX | Chair | 09 September 1997 |
|
|
||||
Ian William King | Trustee | 28 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Roger Edwards | Trustee | 09 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger James Walker | Trustee | 24 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert Bruce Guthrie | Trustee | 24 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
David James Taylor | Trustee | 25 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Mark Hornby | Trustee | 11 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
PETER WILLIAM MASON | Trustee | 23 March 2006 |
|
|
||||
RUPERT THOMAS FOLEY | Trustee | 14 June 1991 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP THOMAS FOLEY | Trustee | 12 October 1989 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.