Financial history THE BOSBURY EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 527140
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £25.76k £70.60k £27.09k £34.20k £32.60k
Total expenditure £7.41k £24.47k £25.34k £24.88k £12.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A