MIDDLETON-ON-THE-HILL PARISH CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Herefordshire
- Shropshire
Governance
- 10 November 1978: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTIN DESBOROUGH | Trustee | 22 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN WILLIAM MOSELEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THOMAS JOHN MERRICK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CLARE HALLS | Trustee |
|
||||||
PHILIP REYNOLDS | Trustee |
|
||||||
WILLIAM EVAN PRICE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAMELA LOUISE MOSELEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.33k | £3.30k | £3.35k | £3.36k | £3.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.23k | £2.92k | £3.35k | £3.72k | £3.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 10 NOVEMBER 1978
Charitable objects
THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IS TO BE APPLIED EITHER FOR RELIEF IN NEED OR FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF MIDDLETON-ON-THE-HILL
Contact information
- Address:
-
HIGHLANDS
LEYSTERS
LEOMINSTER
HR6 0HP
- Phone:
- 01568750257
- Email:
- leystershalls@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window