CHARITIES ADMINISTERED ICW THE LONG EATON SCHOOL

Charity number: 527166
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Trustees make awards annually to certain pupils who attend or who have just left the Long Eaton School. These awards are known as the Samuel Clegg Awards, the John Crompton Memorial Prize, the Lord Houghton Award, the Ken Plampin Memorial Prize, the Roger Graham Award for Outstanding Overall Leadership and the Barbara James Environment Award.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £1,370
Total expenditure: £1,475

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 May 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SAMUEL CLEGG SCHOLARSHIP FUND (Working name)
  • CHARITIES ADMINISTERED ICW LONG EATON COMMUNITY SCHOOL (Previous name)
  • CHARITIES ADMINISTERED ICW LONG EATON SCHOOL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Charles Lord Chair 14 June 2022
None on record
Samuel Peter Dorrington Trustee 26 September 2024
None on record
Denise Ann Hopkins Trustee 26 September 2024
None on record
Mark Andrew Shipman Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Debra Louise Willey Trustee 13 September 2022
None on record
Barbara Lesley James Trustee 04 September 2009
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £1.21k £1.23k £1.46k £1.31k £1.37k
Total expenditure £1.15k £1.18k £1.48k £1.27k £1.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 12 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 08 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 06 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 30 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 02 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED AT NOTTINGHAM PROBATE REGISTRY ON 22 FEBRUARY 1974
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE TWO ANNUAL PRIZES FOR A BOY AND GIRL RESPECTIVELY AT ROPER SECONDARY SCHOOL AT LONG EATON.
Area of benefit
LONG EATON
Registration history
  • 06 May 1964 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
THE LONG EATON SCHOOL
THORESBY ROAD
LONG EATON
NOTTINGHAM
NG10 3NP
Phone:
0115 973 2438
Email:
No information available