ANTHONY GELL SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of items, services and facilities at Anthony Gell School. The promotion of the education of persons in need of financial assistance, who are or at any time have attended the school, or are under the age of 25 and are resident in the parish of Wirksworth and the surrounding villages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 28 July 1966: Standard registration
- ANTHONY GELL SCHOOL FOUNDATION (Working name)
- ANTHONY GELL'S GRAMMAR SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Elizabeth Burkinshaw | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adam Lathbury | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Foote | Trustee | 31 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lee David Shakespeare | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Hedderwick | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER ROYSTON WHITTALL | Trustee | 14 March 2018 |
|
|||||
SIMON HOBBS | Trustee | 31 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.15k | £50.49k | £102.77k | £101.65k | £126.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.90k | £43.24k | £39.38k | £90.90k | £66.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 25 MAY 2005 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 23 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
1) THE PROVISIONS OF ITEMS SERVICES AND FACILITIES FOR ANTHONY GELL SCHOOL 2) THE PROMOTION OF THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE IN THE FOLLOWING ORDER OF PRIORITY A) PERSONS WHO ARE ATTENDING THE SCHOOL AND; B) PERSONS WHO HAVE AT ANY TIME ATTENDED THE SCHOOL AND C)PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 RESIDING IN THE PARISH OF WIRKSWORTH AND THE SURROUNDING VILLAGES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Little Bolehill
Bolehill
Matlock
DE4 4GR
- Phone:
- 07941391834
- Email:
- secy.agsf@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window