ST JOSEPH'S CONVENT SCHOOL

Charity number: 527184
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

NURSERY SCHOOL

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £282,264
Total expenditure: £307,309

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 July 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST JOSEPHS LITTLE SCHOLARS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sister ANNA YEO CHAI LUAN Trustee 02 September 2023
THE DAUGHTERS OF DIVINE CHARITY (SWAFFHAM, NORFOLK)
Received: On time
SISTER JACINTA Trustee
THE DAUGHTERS OF DIVINE CHARITY (SWAFFHAM, NORFOLK)
Received: On time
SISTER THOMAS MORE Trustee
THE DAUGHTERS OF DIVINE CHARITY (SWAFFHAM, NORFOLK)
Received: On time
SISTER FRANCIS Trustee
THE DAUGHTERS OF DIVINE CHARITY (SWAFFHAM, NORFOLK)
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £204.56k £277.66k £249.19k £275.26k £282.26k
Total expenditure £428.23k £291.85k £263.45k £269.02k £307.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 25 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 14 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Josephs Convent
42 Newbold Road
CHESTERFIELD
Derbyshire
S41 7PL
Phone:
01760724577
Email:
No information available
Website:

st-josephs-convent-sch.org.uk