JOHN SKINNER'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 527227
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2006

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Herefordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 June 1964: Standard registration
  • 13 December 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2004 31/12/2006
Total gross income £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2006 05 December 2007 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2004 17 October 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not Required