BROMYARD GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assists young people (up to the age of 25 years) within the catchment area of Queen Elizabeth High School with awards towards costs when undertaking further education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 07 May 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES ARTHUR JACOBSEN | Chair | 14 February 2012 |
|
|||||
Dr Mary Deidre Dunne-Thomas | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Phillip Warrey | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sally Elizabeth Handley | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Charlotte Emma Martin | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|||||
ROGER WILKINS FRICS | Trustee | 28 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ray Whittaker | Trustee | 23 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Farmer | Trustee | 18 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM TUDOR JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.31k | £11.08k | £13.76k | £15.41k | £15.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.88k | £11.37k | £11.15k | £14.92k | £14.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME 17 DECEMBER 1971, AMENDED BY ORDER OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION 14 JUNE 2005, BY RESOLUTIONS PASSED AT MEETINGS ON 09 NOVEMBER 2005, 05 MARCH 2008 AND 18 MARCH 2009.
Charitable objects
1. THE PROVISION OF SPECIAL BENEFITS, OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY, FOR THE QUEEN ELIZABETH SCHOOL, BROMYARD. 2. THE PROVISION OF OTHER EDUCATIONAL BENEFITS IN THE WAY OF EXHIBITIONS FOR SECONDARY OR FURTHER EDUCATION, (INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL AND TECHNICAL EDUCATION).
Area of benefit
THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE QUEEN ELIZABETH SCHOOL, BROMYARD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pound
Hampton Charles
TENBURY WELLS
Worcestershire
WR15 8PZ
- Phone:
- 07866448826
- Email:
- bromyardgsf@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window