LAWSON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides grants for further education. Funds prizes for academic excellence. Raises and distributes funds for educational purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Gateshead
Governance
- 20 October 1964: Standard registration
- 22 October 2014: Funds received from 527359-7 J LOCKET PRIZES FOR MUSIC
- 22 October 2014: Funds received from 527359-6 MARK PRINGLE FOR MATHEMATICS
- 22 October 2014: Funds received from 527359-5 MISS JANE COWEN EXHIBITIONS
- 22 October 2014: Funds received from 527359-4 R N WILSON AND OLD BLAYDONIAN ENDOWMENT
- 22 October 2014: Funds received from 527359-3 THE COLONEL JOSEPH COWAN EXHIBITION
- 22 October 2014: Funds received from 527359-2 MARY THOMSON MEMORIAL PRIZE
- 22 October 2014: Funds received from 527359-1 MISS WINIFRED MCTAGGART HISTORY PRIZE
- 22 October 2014: Funds received from 527359 CHARITIES IN CONNETION WITH BLAYDON COMPREHENSIVE ...
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda French BA Hons | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|||||||
Rev Alison Stewart-Smith | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
MR DAVE CHARLTON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £958 | £975 | £1.00k | £1.01k | £1.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £575 | £255 | £850 | £926 | £780 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 October 2022 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 October 2021 | 115 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 26TH NOVEMBER 1880 AS VARIED BY SCHEME DATED 3RD JANUARY 1899 AS AMENDED ON 9 DECEMBER 2004 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER SECTION 74 (2) (C) AND SECTION 74 (2) (D) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN ATTENDING PUBLIC ELEMENTARY SCHOOLS BY REWARDS OR PRIZES.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF RYTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
STANEGATE
NORTH ROAD
HALTWHISTLE
NE49 9ND
- Phone:
- 01434320863
- Email:
- dave.jch@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window