FULTHORPE EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 04 October 1965: Standard registration
- 26 February 1997: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 9TH FEBRUARY 1886 AS VARIED BY SCHEME DATED 2ND JUNE 1891 AS AMENDED ON THE 4 OCTOBER 1993 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 44 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1992
Charitable objects
1. TO APPLY A YEARLY SUM NOT EXCEEDING $2 IN THE PURCHASE OF BIBLES AND COMMON PRAYER BOOKS, TO BE AWARDED TO DESERVING CHILDREN ATTENDING PUBLIC ELEMENTARY SCHOOLS. 2. ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN ATTENDING PUBLIC ELEMENTARY SCHOOLS BY AWARDING REWARDS OR PRIZES AND PAYMENTS TO ENCOURAGE CONTINUANCE AT SCHOOL FOR EXHIBITIONS FOR EDUCATION HIGHER THAN ELEMENTARY OR FOR TECHNICAL, PROFESSIONAL OR INDUSTRIAL INSTRUCTION.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF STRANTON AND HART
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.