Financial history BARNARD CASTLE AND DISTRICT ROUND TABLE PRIZE FUND (IN CONNECTION WITH BARNARD CASTLE, BALIOL SCHOOL)
Charity number: 527365
Charity reporting is overdue by 1710 days
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2 | £2 | £2 | £2 | £2 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10 | £10 | £10 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.