TEESSIDE HIGH SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 527386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE SCHOOL'S PRINCIPAL ACTIVITY IS THE PROVISION OF A DAY SCHOOL FOR 3 - 18 YEAR OLDS.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire
  • Stockton-on-tees

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 January 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • TEESSIDE PREPARATORY AND HIGH SCHOOL (Working name)
  • TEESIDE HIGH SCHOOL LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROBERT RALPH TINDLE Chair
THE CHARLES URIE PEAT PRIZE FUND
Received: On time
Neil McMillan Trustee 26 June 2024
None on record
David Macafee Trustee 15 March 2023
None on record
Dr Angela Steele Trustee 26 September 2018
None on record
Andrew Warrior Trustee 30 September 2015
None on record
TREVOR COOK Trustee 15 March 2014
THE CHARLES URIE PEAT PRIZE FUND
Received: On time
Robert James Stone Trustee 29 January 2014
None on record
CHARLES ATHA Trustee
None on record
ALISON LESLEY GREENWOOD Trustee
None on record
CHARLES GEOFFREY WATSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £4.08m £4.02m £3.09m £4.38m £4.48m
Total expenditure £3.87m £3.87m £3.63m £4.16m £4.29m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £17.44k £62.77k £75.06k £104.49k £49.10k
Income - Other trading activities £25.11k £16.26k £16.40k £24.64k £43.77k
Income - Charitable activities £4.04m £3.94m £3.71m £4.24m £4.36m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £457 £483 £184 £8.82k £26.75k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.87m £3.87m £3.63m £4.16m £4.29m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £55.76k £50.48k £57.64k £65.82k £64.72k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Own use assets £4.05m £3.98m £4.46m £4.42m £4.41m
Long-term investments £100.04k £100.52k £100.72k £100.72k £100.81k
Other assets £335.87k £431.14k £1.46m £1.65m £1.85m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £2.15m £2.03m £3.36m £3.28m £3.28m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 23 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 23 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 31 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 31 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 06 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 06 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 14 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 30 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 30 July 2020 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 30 July 2020 60 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 23 JULY 1976
Charitable objects
(1) PROVIDING BUILDINGS FOR USE OF TEESSIDE HIGH SCHOOL ON LAND BELONGING TO TEESSIDE HIGH SCHOOL LTD. (2) REPAIRING, MAINTAINING AND IMPROVING BUILDINGS ON LAND BELONGING TO TEESSIDE HIGH SCHOOL LTD AND USED FOR THE SAID SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 22 January 1963 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
TEESSIDE HIGH SCHOOL
THE AVENUE
EAGLESCLIFFE
STOCKTON-ON-TEES
TS16 9AT
Phone:
01642782095