THE NORTON-JUXTA-KEMPSEY EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Money may be available for the advancement of Education for children who or whose parents are bona-fide resident in the parish of Norton-Juxta-Kempsey by way of rewards to children at school, payments for continuance at school and exhibitions for higher education subject to certain specified conditions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 13 December 1962: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANET FRANKLIN | Trustee |
|
||||
CHRISTINE GRANT | Trustee |
|
||||
CHRISTINE MCGOVERN | Trustee |
|
||||
MICHAEL REEVES | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £138 | £164 | £140 | £146 | £146 | |
|
Total expenditure | £220 | £50 | £125 | £92 | £235 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 28 JULY 1882
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN WHO OR WHOSE PARENTS ARE BONA-FIDE RESIDENT IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA BY WAY OF REWARDS TO CHILDREN AT SCHOOL PAYMENTS FOR CONTINUANCE AT SCHOOL AND EXHIBITIONS FOR HIGHER EDUCATION, SUBJECT TO CERTAIN SPECIFIED CONDITIONS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF NORTON-JUXTA-KEMPSEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
WINDSOR COTTAGE
CHURCH LANE
NORTON
WORCESTER
WR5 2PR
- Phone:
- 01905820459
- Email:
- mcgovern260@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window