THE WINSLOW EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 527475
Charity reporting is overdue by 205 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Helps the needy and poor, educational needs and for children in need

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022

Total income: £241
Total expenditure: £241

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 December 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • KEMPSEY CHURCH LANDS CHARITIES (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Venerable Mark Badger Trustee 24 November 2015
MOTOV8
Received: On time
CHURCH LANDS
Charity reporting is overdue by 936 days
INNERVATION TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
WORCESTER DIOCESAN ORDINATION CANDIDATES FUND
Received: On time
WORCESTER DIOCESAN SITES AND BUILDINGS FUND
Received: On time
THE WORCESTER DIOCESAN SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY FUND
Received: On time
WORCESTER DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LIMITED
Received: On time
Catherine Blackwell Trustee 24 November 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £222 £220 £761 £776 £241
Total expenditure £222 £220 £761 £776 £241
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 205 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 205 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 March 2022 135 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
14 NAPLETON LANE
KEMPSEY
WORCESTER
WR5 3PT
Phone:
01905828096
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available