Accounts and annual returns THE BEWDLEY MUSEUM

Charity number: 527511
Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 September 2022 224 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 March 2021 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required