THE OUSELEY CHURCH MUSIC TRUST

Charity Number: 527519
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

"To promote and maintain to a high standard the choral services of the Church of England, the Church in Wales or the Church of Ireland (whether simple or elaborate) in such way as the trustees see fit ... including the promotion of the religious, musical and secular education of pupils attending any school in which instruction in the doctrines of ... the said Churches is given ..."

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £191,647
Total expenditure: £163,485

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Gibraltar
  • Guernsey
  • Ireland
  • Isle Of Man
  • Jersey
  • Northern Ireland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 December 1989: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • OUSELEY TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr STEPHEN MARK Darlington MBE Chair 09 October 1997
THE CARDINALL'S MUSICK LTD
Received: On time
John Francis Attwater Trustee 23 September 2024
CHICHESTER CATHEDRAL CHORISTERS' ASSOCIATION'S SCHOLARSHIP TRUST
Received: On time
FAIRSTEAD HOUSE SCHOOL TRUST LTD
Received: On time
THE KING'S SCHOOL WORCESTER DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
THOMAS HAROLD DAGGETT Trustee 23 September 2024
None on record
Carl Anthony Jackson Trustee 06 December 2021
BRUNSWICK VOCAL ARTS
Received: On time
DR MARTIN CLARKE YOUNG ORGAN SCHOLARS' TRUST
Received: On time
The Grinstead Music Fund
Received: On time
GUILD OF CHURCH MUSICIANS
Received: On time
Samantha Bradburne Trustee 13 May 2019
None on record
David Lowe Trustee 17 October 2017
None on record
SIMON GEORGE MICHAEL HIRTZEL Trustee 09 May 2017
None on record
DR JO SPREADBURY Trustee 28 April 2014
CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF ST THOMAS OF CANTERBURY PORTSMOUTH
Recently registered
GILLIAN PERKINS Trustee 19 December 2013
None on record
Paul Mason Trustee 02 April 2013
None on record
Dr JOHN MILFORD RUTTER CBE Trustee 07 October 2000
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £180.97k £155.34k £148.55k £163.48k £191.65k
Total expenditure £234.46k £410.18k £154.01k £154.29k £163.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 17 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 03 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 06 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 15 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 November 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 November 2020 1 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 6 DECEMBER 1989
Charitable objects
SUBJECT TO THE PAYMENT OF EXPENSES THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME, AND AT THEIR DISCRETION THE WHOLE OR PART OF THE PROPERTY, OF THE FUND FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE OUSELEY TRUST
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 06 December 1989 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
PO BOX 1505
Wroxham
Norwich
NR12 8TJ
Phone:
07912696852