SEBRIGHT'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Offers financial assistance, further education grants, bursaries to assist with the payment of school fees and capital grants to schools and other charitable educational organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Dudley
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 20 December 1962: Standard registration
- SEBRIGHTS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maxine Yvonne Huselbee | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
David James Binnian | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lyndon Darkes | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Andrew John WEBBER | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Agnes Bordewich | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Constantinou | Trustee | 15 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charles Anthony SHERREY | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
EMMA GRIFFIN | Trustee | 14 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN REGINALD BRYSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR CHRIS NICHOLLS | Trustee |
|
||||||
TREVOR JOHN BOTTERILL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £186.05k | £183.42k | £190.54k | £196.75k | £202.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £186.05k | £183.42k | £190.54k | £196.75k | £202.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 10 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 10 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 12/02/1973 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 08/03/1997 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 23/12/1980 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 08/05/2002 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 30/12/2002 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 01/07/2015 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 05 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
TO CONDUCT THE TWO SCHOOLS OF THE FOUNDATION. TO HELP WITH THE MAINTENANCE OF THE WOLVERLEY, SEBRIGHT PRIMARY SCHOOL, TO HELP WITH THE COST OF EXTRAORDINARY REPAIRS, ADDITIONS OR IMPROVEMENTS TO THIS AND TO THE COOKLEY, SEBRIGHT SCHOOL, TO PROVIDE SPECIAL BENEFITS INCLUDING EQUIPMENT OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR FURTHER OBJECTS SEE SCHEME 12 FEBRUARY 1973
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF WOLVERLEY AND IN SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Leywood
4 Wyre Mill Lane
Wolverley
Worcestershire
DY11 5TR
- Phone:
- 01562820181
- Email:
- clerk@sebrights.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window