MALVERN COLLEGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£36,391,083
Donations and legacies | £782.73k | |
Charitable activities | £29.77m | |
Other trading activities | £5.56m | |
Investments | £275.62k | |
Other | £9.08k |
Total expenditure:
£36,872,159
Raising funds | £3.22m | |
Charitable activities | £33.65m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.22m | |
Charitable expenditure | £33.65m |
People

508 Employee(s)
18 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 27 |
£70k to £80k | 10 |
£80k to £90k | 3 |
£90k to £100k | 3 |
£100k to £110k | 2 |
£150k to £200k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 01 November 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBIN KENNEDY BLACK | Chair |
|
||||||
Saira Uppal | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Penrice | Trustee | 21 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Jane Francis | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neil Jones | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Yeo | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kasper Nikolai Christian August Hartmann | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Collins | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Stuart King | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tom Whittaker | Trustee | 23 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Roger Harry Brierly | Trustee | 23 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Charles Barwell OBE | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Louise Penrice | Trustee | 09 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ben Walker | Trustee | 09 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Sandbrook | Trustee | 10 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sue Duff | Trustee | 05 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Paul Nicholls | Trustee | 05 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
TIM STRAKER | Trustee | 05 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.80m | £26.37m | £29.94m | £39.66m | £36.39m | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.05m | £27.42m | £30.55m | £36.15m | £36.87m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £933.11k | £315.47k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £568.85k | £1.30m | £394.94k | £5.49m | £782.73k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £3.69m | £3.29m | £4.46m | £4.98m | £5.56m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £20.61m | £21.77m | £25.07m | £29.16m | £29.77m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £4.96m | £3.00k | £8.79k | £33.56k | £275.62k | |
|
Income - Other | £973.26k | £15.82k | £1.06k | £4.17k | £9.08k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £25.39m | £25.96m | £28.89m | £33.86m | £33.65m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.66m | £1.46m | £1.67m | £2.29m | £3.22m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £67.05k | £50.57k | £64.19k | £94.59k | £101.11k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £32.93m | £32.61m | £31.70m | £29.65m | £29.44m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £90.80k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £10.68m | £11.60m | £11.20m | £21.15m | £26.06m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £20.67m | £21.98m | £20.86m | £24.68m | £29.99m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 23RD JANUARY 1929 AS VARIED BY SCHEME DATED 3 AUGUST 1992 AND SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 13 OCTOBER 1992
Charitable objects
(1) TO CARRY ON AT MALVERN IN THE COUNTY OF WORCESTER OR ELSEWHERE A SCHOOL FOR BOYS AND GIRLS OR FOR CHILDREN OF EITHER SEX IN WHICH THEY MAY RECEIVE A SOUND RELIGIOUS, CLASSICAL, MATHEMATICAL, SCIENTIFIC AND GENERAL EDUCATION IN CONFORMITY WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.(2) TO MAINTAIN, ALTER,ENLARGE OR IMPROVE ANY BUILDINGS OR PROPERTY FOR THE TIME BEING BELONGING TO OR TO BE USED FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE COLLEGE AND TO PROVIDE SUCH FURTHER BUILDINGS, APPLIANCES AND CONVENIENCES FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE COLLEGE AS MAY BE NECESSARY OR PROPER.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- BOLDERO NATURAL HISTORY PRIZE FUND
- BURKE MILITARY PRIZE FUND
- CHRISTOPHER LEY SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- FABER EXHIBITION TRUST FUND
- FRANCIS WILLIAM ASTON PHYSICS PRIZE
- FREDERICK ROSS DUNTON MUSIC PRIZE FUND
- GALE ENTOMOLOGY PRIZE FUND
- GEORGE DOVE SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- GEORGE LECHMERE ANSON SCHOLARSHIP
- GEORGE WRIGHT WRIGHT-INGLE EXHIBITION
- HANSELL FRENCH AND GERMAN PRIZE FUND
- HENRY FERDINAND SITZLER PRIZE
- J H H DAVY SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- JOHN NEILL BLACK EXHIBITION
- KENNETH ARTHUR JEAVONS BURSARY
- KESSLER GERMAN PRIZE
- LEA SCHOLARSHIP
- LEA SHAKESPEARE PRIZE FUND
- LEA-SMITH READING PRIZE FUND
- LYGON SCHOLARSHIP TRUST FUND
- MARTIN HISTORY PRIZE FUND
- MAURICE LEY SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- MILWARD PRIZE FOR MATHEMATICS
- MORGAN ENGINEERING PRIZE FUND
- NOEL HERBERT STONE TRUST FUND
- OLD HALL BURSARSHIP
- PERRINS ENGLISH ESSAY PRIZE FUND
- PETER MARSHALL MEDICAL PRIZE
- POTTER PRIZE FOR CLASSICS
- R C B YATES PRIZE FOR LATIN VERSE
- SHAW POLITICAL ECONOMY PRIZE FUND
- THOMAS GAIR EXHIBITION
- WARRINGTON EXHIBITION TRUST FUND
- WILFRED BARHAM EXHIBITION
- 01 November 1963 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
MALVERN COLLEGE
COLLEGE ROAD
MALVERN
WR14 3DF
- Phone:
- 01684581643
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window