KING CHARLES THE FIRST'S SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide benefits to King Charles1 School, Kidderminster,to provide awards and financial assistance to pupils and former pupils of that School and to promote the education of pupils and former pupils of that School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Worcestershire
Governance
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony John KIDD | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
DAVID STEPHEN SIMONS | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD NEIL WOOLLEY | Trustee | 08 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Michael Shelton | Trustee | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.86k | £68.51k | £70.99k | £71.70k | £72.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.86k | £68.51k | £70.99k | £71.70k | £72.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 16/02/1960 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 25/10/1985 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 01/04/2012
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF BENEFITS FOR THE SCHOOL. EXHIBITIONS TO PUPILS ATTENDING OR WHO HAVE ATTENTED THE SCHOOL, TENABLE AT THE SCHOOL, OR AT ANY TRAINING COLLEGE FOR TEACHERS UNIVERSITY OR OTHER INSTITUTION OF FURTHER EDUCATION. TO ASSIST PUPILS, AND FORMER PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL, TO ENTER INTO A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING. TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION, INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING OF PUPILS AND FORMER PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 16 January 1984 : Standard registration
- 04 April 2002 : Removed
- 04 April 2002 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE HEATH
WILDEN TOP ROAD
STOURPORT-ON-SEVERN
DY13 9JF
- Phone:
- 01299823458
- Email:
- morgproof@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window