Financial history QUEEN ELIZABETH'S GRAMMAR SCHOOL CHARITY

Charity number: 527603
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £42.59k £38.24k £38.83k £39.32k £36.71k
Total expenditure £34.69k £222.24k £30.74k £770 £826
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A