Financial history FOUNDATION OF CHRIST'S HOSPITAL AT LINCOLN

Charity number: 527616
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £186.37k £211.43k £101.20k £115.71k £67.46k
Total expenditure £154.93k £56.81k £52.00k £81.89k £374.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A