THOMAS PARRY'S FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To award a gold medal known as the Parry Gold Medal to the best academic student at Boston Grammar School each year, as agreed by the Trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 29 April 1964: Standard registration
- PARRYS SCHOLARSHIP & GOLD MEDAL TRUSTEES (Working name)
- THOMAS PERRY'S FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Alan Joseph Sharman | Trustee | 15 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Patrick McHenry | Trustee | 03 November 2014 |
|
|||||
BRIAN WILLIAM PYCOCK | Trustee | 22 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1 | £2 | £0 | £0 | £2 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 02 March 2023 | 215 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 02 March 2023 | 580 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 02 March 2023 | 945 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11/12/1875 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 04/11/2013
Charitable objects
AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS TO BOYS WHO HAVE BEEN EDUCATED AT ONE OF THE FOLLOWING SCHOOLS IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA (1) THE NATIONAL SCHOOL (2) THE WESLEYAN SCHOOL (3) THE PUBLIC SCHOOL (4) THE SAINT NICHOLAS AND HOLY TRINITY SCHOOL (5) LAUGHTON'S CHARITY SCHOOL TENABLE AT BOSTON GRAMMAR SCHOOL AWARD OF A GOLD MEDAL TO THE BEST SCHOLAR IN BOSTON GRAMMAR SCHOOL SURPLUS INCOME TO BE USED FOR THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF LEARNING IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA.
Area of benefit
BOSTON AND SKIRBECK
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHATTERTONS
28 WIDE BARGATE
BOSTON
PE21 6RT
- Phone:
- 01205351114
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window