JANE PALMER'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing income for students at College, University & Further Education for residents of Burgh le Marsh up to the age of 25. To provide the local C of E School with extra money for books, etc. The money is provided from rent income from a parcel of land left for this purpose.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 16 March 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN LYALL | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev AIDEN JAMES ALEXANDER EDWARDS father | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAUL HENRY HAYTER | Trustee | 25 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Valerie Christine Howard | Trustee | 25 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Rosalind Phillips | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
CECIL WILLIAM SMITH | Trustee | 11 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANN HURDMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.63k | £4.44k | £4.53k | £4.57k | £4.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.79k | £4.25k | £4.25k | £4.64k | £4.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 27TH OCTOBER 1964
Charitable objects
(A) PROVISION OF SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR THE BURGH LE MARSH CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL (B) BENEFIT OF YOUNG PERSONS UNDER 25 YEARS OLD, RESIDENT IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE BY (I) PROVISION OF EXHIBITIONS, GRANTS OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TENABLE AT ANY INSTITUTION OF FURTHER EDUCATION. (II) FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO HELP BENEFICIARIES ON LEAVING AN EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT TO PREPARE FOR, OR TO ENTER, A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING. (III) APPRENTICING THEM TO SOME USEFUL TRADE OR OCCUPATION. (IV) IN OTHERWISE PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING)
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF BURGH LE MARSH
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 CUMBERLIDGE CLOSE
BURGH LE MARSH
SKEGNESS
PE24 5BG
- Phone:
- 01754810931
- Email:
- k.turner931@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window