TYLER EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 527691
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Markes grants to individuals who are aged 21 and under for financial assistance with educational needs

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023

Total income: £6,606
Total expenditure: £14,322

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 January 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alan Henry Welsh Trustee 02 July 2024
CHARITY OF JOSHUA TYLER FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF TEAM GAINSBOROUGH & MORTON
Received: 28 days late
Carol Smith Trustee 08 September 2022
None on record
Trevor Victor Young Trustee 04 June 2021
CHARITY OF JOSHUA TYLER FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
Rev Canon STEPHEN WILLIAM JOHNSON Trustee 11 November 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF TEAM GAINSBOROUGH & MORTON
Received: 28 days late
WALTER GERMAN ROSE MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIPS
Received: On time
GAINSBOROUGH EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF JOSHUA TYLER FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
FRANCIS BARKER'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Judith Helen Butroid Trustee 01 October 2014
CHARITY OF JOSHUA TYLER FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
HILARY ELISABETH CHURCHMAN Trustee
CHARITY OF JOSHUA TYLER FOR THE POOR
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £5.34k £2.88k £6.78k £4.06k £6.61k
Total expenditure £7.79k £3.78k £980 £2.05k £14.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 08 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2022 24 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2021 29 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2020 29 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 23 October 2020 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
22 MARKET PLACE
GAINSBOROUGH
LINCOLNSHIRE
DN21 2BZ
Phone:
07961711333
Website:

No information available