Trustees KITCHINGS EDUCATIONAL CHARITY

Charity Number: 527707
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BARRY PERCIVAL Chair
KITCHINGS GENERAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Cllr Ian Gordon Fleetwood Trustee 27 September 2024
None on record
SAMANTHA JUNE SYKES Trustee 12 October 2021
None on record
LOUISE MILLS Trustee 02 October 2017
None on record
Katrina Thomas Trustee 14 April 2015
None on record
MR K HUTCHINSON Trustee 24 January 2012
KITCHINGS GENERAL CHARITY
Received: On time
MRS M SANKEY Trustee
None on record