THE PELL EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the education of young children in the parishes of Asgarby, Evedon, Ewerby and Howell Lincolnshire currently acheived by the making of grants for educational benefit and the provision of annual education excursions for such children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 17 January 1964: Standard registration
- PELL'S CHARITY (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Sardeson | Chair | 28 July 2014 |
|
|||||
Victoria Louise Howe | Trustee | 23 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elisabeth Anne Robertson | Trustee | 23 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
MR MICK PRIESTLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.90k | £3.04k | £1.73k | £6.13k | £5.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £120 | £5.25k | £120 | £0 | £1.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 202 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 202 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 568 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 568 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 December 2021 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES DATED 16TH FEBRUARY 1926 AND 31ST JULY 1931
Charitable objects
ASSISTING PUPILS TO OBTAIN EDUCATION OTHER THAN ELEMENTARY. MAKING ARRANGEMENTS FOR ATTENDING TO THE HEALTH OF SCHOOL CHILDREN. OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF POORER CHILDREN IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF EWERBY EVEDON, ASGARBY AND HOWELL
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHATTERTONS
5 MARKET STREET
SLEAFORD
NG34 7SQ
- Phone:
- 01529411500
- Email:
- kate.twigg@chattertons.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window