TRAFFORD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 527780
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide funding for education

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £1,190
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 May 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL JOHN TAYLOR Chair
WILLIAM MEDLEY'S CHARITY
Received: 110 days late
BRIGSTOCK AND WRENS CHARITY
Received: On time
ROBIN RAYMOND HOWES Trustee
None on record
MR DAVID BEETON Trustee
None on record
RICHARD ARTHUR SPINKS Trustee
TYDD ST MARY VILLAGE HALL TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.19k £0 £63 £1.19k £1.19k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 October 2024 339 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 December 2021 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
15 SOUTH BRINK
WISBECH
CAMBS
PE13 1JL
Phone:
01945583194
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available