FRAMPTON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Financially assist residents of the Parish of Frampton for educational purposes in accordance with the application of income schedule and specific community causes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 27 May 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wendy Ann Cope | Chair |
|
||||||
Stuart John Ashton | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|||||
David Hildred | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|||||
AMANDA FOSSITT | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Colin Semmelroth | Trustee | 17 February 2012 |
|
|||||
JOHN COOPER | Trustee |
|
||||||
MYRA ROSE SCOTT | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR TED KING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.32k | £5.03k | £4.20k | £4.64k | £8.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.76k | £4.01k | £6.02k | £5.20k | £3.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 August 2024 | 191 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 16 OCTOBER 1889 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 20 AUGUST 1907 AND 9 OCTOBER 1980
Charitable objects
CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF POOR CHILDREN OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA, ATTENDING A PUBLIC ELEMENTARY SCHOOL BY PRIZES OR REWARDS, PAYMENTS TO ENCOURAGE CONTINUANCE AT SCHOOL, EXHIBITIONS AT ANY PLACE OF EDUCATION HIGHER THAN ELEMENTARY, LECTURES OR EVENING CLASSES AND PAYMENTS TOWARDS THE SCHOOL OF THE FOUNDATION.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF FRAMPTON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MOORE THOMPSON
BANK HOUSE
BROAD STREET
SPALDING
PE11 1TB
- Phone:
- 01775711333
- Email:
- louise@mooret.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window