OAKHAM SCHOOL RUTLAND

Charity number: 527825
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The provision of boarding and day schooling for children between the ages of 10 and 18

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2008

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Rutland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 April 1987: Standard registration
  • 01 September 2009: Removed
  • 01 September 2009: Funds transferred to 1131425 OAKHAM SCHOOL
Organisation type:
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2004 31/08/2005 31/08/2006 31/08/2007 31/08/2008
Total gross income £14.72m £15.93m £17.20m £18.75m £19.92m
Total expenditure £14.25m £15.51m £16.57m £17.91m £19.45m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £774.00k £677.00k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £17.35m £18.57m
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £90.00k £158.00k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £535.00k £509.00k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £17.11m £18.97m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £40.00k £28.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £383.00k £220.00k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2004 31/08/2005 31/08/2006 31/08/2007 31/08/2008
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A £23.35m £24.42m
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A £799.00k £725.00k
Other assets N/A N/A N/A £1.95m £750.00k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A £9.11m £8.52m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2008 20 March 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 23 March 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2007 18 June 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 14 April 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2006 29 June 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 22 June 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2005 30 June 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2005 30 June 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2004 30 June 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2004 28 June 2005 On Time

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
NO FORMAL TRUST INSTRUMENT
Charitable objects
AN ANNUAL MUSIC PRIZE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 21 April 1987 : Standard registration
  • 01 September 2009 : Removed
  • 01 September 2009 : Asset transfer out