CHARITIES IN CONNECTION WITH WYGGESTON COLLEGIATE
Charity number: 527836
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2004
Total income: £1,080
Total expenditure: £450
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
No information available
Where the charity operates:
- Leicester City
Governance
Registration history:
- 20 April 1965: Standard registration
- 09 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £450 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2004 | 31 March 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEE INDIVIDUAL CONSTITUENTS
Charitable objects
SEE INDIVIDUAL CONSTITUENTS
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
LEICESTER
Linked charities
Linked charities
- ELEANOR RUSSELL MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- ELIZA JANE ALLEN PRIZE FUND
- FLORENCE MARSTON PRIZE FUND
- G T E AND EILEEN CHAMBERLAIN PRIZE FUND
- L FREEMAN PRIZE FUND
- MARY ELLEN SELBY PRIZE FUND
- MAY AND LAURA WARD SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- MISS ETHEL M ROBINSON SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- MISS M A E BUTLER PRIZE FUND
- NORA CARESS MEMORIAL PRIZE FUND
- RICHARD HALLAM ENGLISH STUDIES PRIZE FUND
Governing document
WILL DATED 4 DECEMBER 1934
Charitable objects
THE FOUNDING OF SCHOLARSHIPS TO BE AWARDED AT THE DISCRETION OF THE HEADMISTRESS OF THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 20 April 1965 : Standard registration
- 09 September 2009 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window