THE DIXIE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the foundation are to assist the finances of the primary school of Market Bosworth, The High School of Market Bosworth, associated schools and organisations within the beneficial areas, and to assist with grants for the educational benefit of young persons under 25 years of age, who reside in the beneficial or extended beneficial areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 01 September 1972: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gemma Tallis | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Mackley | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michelle nelson | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
William John Crooks | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Martin Cartwright | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Morrell | Trustee | 06 March 2020 |
|
|||||
MAUREEN COOK | Trustee | 06 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Martin Reed | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Brooke | Trustee | 01 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Dixie | Trustee | 05 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN SUTTON | Trustee | 13 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
JANE GLENNON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.38k | £116.57k | £130.18k | £135.31k | £141.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.36k | £30.95k | £111.11k | £111.11k | £122.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 February 2025 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 February 2025 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 March 2024 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 March 2024 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 July 2022 | 175 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 July 2022 | 175 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 29 AUGUST 1972 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 31 OCTOBER 1975, 9 JUNE 1987 AND 11 JANUARY 1994
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES MAY APPLY SUCH YEARLY SUM AS THEY THINK FIT, BEING NOT MORE THAN ONE-THIRD OF THE SAID NET INCOME, IN PROVIDING SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS, OF ANY KIND OR NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY, FOR THE PRIMARY SCHOOL OF THE FOUNDATION AND THE SECONDARY SCHOOL NOW KNOWN AS THE MARKET BOSWORTH HIGH SCHOOL.THE TRUSTEES MAY, IN ANY YEAR MAKE PAYMENTS WITHIN THE LIMITS FROM TIME TO TIME AGREED WITH THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS TO THE MANAGERS OF THE BARLESTONE CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL AND TO THE MANAGERS OF ANY NEW SCHOOL OF THE FOUNDATION OR OF ANY NEW VOLUNTARY SCHOOL. THE RESIDUE OF THE SAID NET INCOME OF THE FOUNDATION SHALL BE APPLIED BY THE TRUSTEES FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS OF EITHER SEX WHO HAVE NOT ATTAINED THE AGE OF 25 YEARS, WHO OR WHOSE PARENTS OR GUARDIANS (SAVE AS HEREINAFTER PROVIDED IN THE CASE OF THOSE WHO ARE KIN OF THE FOUNDER) RESIDE IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA OR HAVE AT ANY TIME BEEN RESIDENT IN THAT AREA FOR A PERIOD OF NOT LESS THAN TWO YEARS, AND WHO, IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES, ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ANY VOLUNTARY ORGANISATION IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA THE OBJECTS WHICH ARE, AMONGST OTHER THINGS, DIRECTED TO ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF OR IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR CHILDREN OR YOUNG PERSONS ELIGIBLE AS BENEFICIARIES OF THE FOUNDATION BY DEVELOPING THEIR PHYSICAL,MENTAL AND MORAL CAPACITIES THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES. BENEFICIAL AREA MEANS THE AREA FORMERLY CONTAINED IN THE ANCIENT PARISH OF MARKET BOSWORTH (WITH THE FORMER PARISH OF CADEBY) BEING THE AREA COMPRISING THE CIVIL PARISHES OF MARKET BOSWORTH, BARLESTONE, CARLTON, OSBASTON, SHENTON, SUTTON CHENEY AND CADEBY: FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 22 OF SCHEME DATED 29 AUGUST 1972
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS DESCRIPTION
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cool Hill Farm
Sibson Road
Sheepy Parva
ATHERSTONE
Warwickshire
CV9 3RE
- Phone:
- 01827880548
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window