Accounts and annual returns THE SIR RICHARD RAYNES FOUNDATION AND OTHERS

Charity number: 527908
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 2 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 2 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 17 February 2025 293 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 17 February 2025 293 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 16 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 16 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 15 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 15 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 26 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 26 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window