Financial history THE SIR RICHARD RAYNES FOUNDATION AND OTHERS

Charity number: 527908
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £35.07k £35.36k £36.80k £37.56k £38.71k
Total expenditure £48.87k £21.93k £20.59k £21.87k £11.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A