ALDERMAN NEWTON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION (CLAYBROOKE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support Children and Young people, and Children/Young People's Organisations, in the Claybrooke and Ullesthorpe area, in Education and Training
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 25 June 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Benford Mrs | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Marjory Joanna Fyson | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Vivien Hammond | Trustee | 29 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM FANTHAM | Trustee | 01 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN FOWLER | Trustee | 26 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.99k | £5.99k | £4.35k | £5.29k | £4.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.15k | £5.11k | £4.84k | £5.03k | £5.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 June 2024 | 122 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 21ST FEBRUARY 1957 as amended on 28 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
BENEFIT OF BOYS AND GIRLS RESIDENT IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, BY EXHIBITIONS AT ANY INSTITUTION OF FURTHER EDUCATION HELPING THEM TO PREPARE FOR OR TO ASSIST THEIR ENTRY INTO A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING AND IN OTHERWISE PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF CLAYBROOKE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bosworth House
Main Road
Claybrooke Magna, Lutterworth
Claybrooke Magna, Lutterworth
Leicestershire
LE17 5AJ
- Phone:
- 01455202649
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window