MEDBOURNE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To enable recreational and associated facilities (including but not limited to the children's playground) for the benefit of all in the village of Medbourne, Leicestershire. To ensure the maintenance and ongoing viability of such facilities. Where possible, to promote the education of young persons resident in the area. To support initiatives which further the objects of the charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 23 October 1963: Standard registration
- 12 May 2000: Removed (Does not operate)
- 30 September 2015: Re-registered
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev STEPHEN JOHN BISHOP | Chair | 16 November 2000 |
|
|||||||
Benjamin Ford | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Susan Claire Delaney | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|||||||
Margaret Jean Tuffs | Trustee | 15 December 2010 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.14k | £1.83k | £480 | £996 | £818 | |
|
Total expenditure | £279 | £302 | £426 | £1.16k | £1.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 October 2023 | 343 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 February 2021 | 102 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 21ST DECEMBER 1926 AS AMENDED ON 15 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
1. MAINTENANCE OF MEDBOURNE CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL. 2. THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE FOR HIGHER EDUCATION BY THE PAYMENT OF FEES OR TRAVELLING OR OTHER INCIDENTAL EXPENSES OR THE PROVISION OF MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES.
Area of benefit
CIVIL PARISHES OF MEDBOURNE AND NEVILL HOLT
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Old Green
Medbourne
MARKET HARBOROUGH
Leicestershire
LE16 8DX
- Phone:
- 07786800467
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window