BEAUMONT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 527924
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Manage the assets of the Trust, for the benefit of the local School and local children, and inaccordance with the historic Trust document.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £13,763
Total expenditure: £5,110

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 October 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROGER SMITH Chair 21 November 2019
None on record
Carolyn Robins Trustee 03 November 2023
None on record
Rev'd Canon Sue Field Trustee 03 November 2023
None on record
GEORGINA RAFFLE Trustee 30 June 2016
THE JOINT HOMES COMMITTEE TRUST FUND
Received: On time
W J YAPP BEQUEST
Received: On time
BEAUMONT RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
DEAN BENTON Trustee 26 September 2012
None on record
PAMELA JAYNE HODSON Trustee
None on record
JULIE DRAPER Trustee
None on record
JUDITH SMITH Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £12.79k £10.31k £11.77k £11.66k £13.76k
Total expenditure £2.67k £16.02k £5.55k £5.00k £5.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 05 November 2024 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 March 2021 151 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
138 THE MOOR
COLEORTON
COALVILLE
LE67 8GF
Phone:
01530813360
Website:

No information available