THE HALL AND ABNEY EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 25 June 1963: Standard registration
- 06 June 1994: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF 21 APRIL 1660, ORDER UNDER BOARD OF EDUCATION ACT 1899, S 2(2) AND SCHEME OF 27 NOVEMBER 1905 AS AMENDED ON 24 AUGUST 1993 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 44 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1992.
Charitable objects
1. THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE FOR HIGHER EDUCATION BY MEANS OF BURSARIES. 2. AWARD OF PRIZES TO CHILDREN FOR PROFICIENCY AT SCHOOL. 3. FINANIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE CHILDREN OR YOUNG PERSONS TO FURTHER THEIR EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF MEASHAM.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.