JANE GREENFIELD
Charity Number: 528014
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Governance
Registration history:
- 24 September 1965: Standard registration
- 30 June 2004: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
- 30 June 2004: Funds transferred to 1036097 WALTHAM PRE-SCHOOL
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
No accounts and annual returns information is available for this removed charity
Governing document
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 29TH NOVEMBER 1802 AND SCHEME DATED 12TH AUGUST 1898, AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION 13TH JANUARY 2004 UNDER SECTION 74,
Charitable objects
THE EDUCATION OF POOR BOYS AND GIRLS
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
WALTHAM-ON-THE-WOLDS
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.