THE SHEPSHED BRITISH SCHOOL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trustees meet twice a year usually in May (the AGM) and November and issues grants for educational purposes, the relief or distress of the poor, and to support and improve and conditions of life to individuals or groups within the Shepshed/Hathern boundaries. The chair, treasurer and secretary are appointed annually at the AGM
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 31 May 1965: Standard registration
- SHEPSHED BRITISH SCHOOL TRUST (Working name)
- SHEPSHED OLD BRITISH SCHOOL (Working name)
- SHEPSHED SCHOOL TRUSTEES (Working name)
- THE OLD BRITISH SCHOOL TRUST SHEPSHED (Working name)
- OLD BRITISH SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIGITTE AINSWORTH | Chair | 01 May 2003 |
|
|||||
Bernadette Theresa Blood | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
SHARON ELIZABETH TAYLOR | Trustee | 31 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROGER TITTERTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT BARKER | Trustee |
|
||||||
Edward William Atkin | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.32k | £6.55k | £7.59k | £7.44k | £7.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.70k | £3.39k | £4.47k | £9.84k | £10.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 20 FEBRUARY 1992
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE CLEAR INCOME OF THE CHARITY AND, AT THEIR DISCRETION, THE WHOLE OR PART OF THE PROPERTY THEREOF FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SHEPSHED IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS, OR IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT :- (A) THE RELIEF OF THE AGED, IMPOTENT AND POOR; (B) THE RELIEF OF DISTRESS AND SICKNESS; (C) THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION; (D) THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
SHEPSHED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Field Avenue
Shepshed
LOUGHBOROUGH
Leicestershire
LE12 9SH
- Phone:
- 01509506456
- Email:
- brigi2@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window