GOYDER MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIP

Charity Number: 528063
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide a prize to the most outstanding medical student in Newcastle University

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £150

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Newcastle Upon Tyne City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 September 1973: Standard registration
  • 30 December 2014: Removed (Transfer of funds)
  • 30 December 2014: Funds transferred to 502473 NEWCASTLE HEALTHCARE CHARITY AND OTHER RELATED CHA...
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £150 £150 £150 £150 £150
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2014 24 October 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 25 July 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 28 September 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 07 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 1 FEBRUARY 1972 AND DEED OF APPOINTMENT DATED 20 OCTOBER 1975
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE STUDENT WHO IS ENTITLED TO THE GOYDER MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIP
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 12 September 1973 : Standard registration
  • 30 December 2014 : Removed
  • 30 December 2014 : Asset transfer out