THE ROYAL VICTORIA TRUST FOR THE BLIND

Charity number: 528072
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are a grant giving charitable trust which supports local organisations, charities and groups working primarily for and with people with sight loss. Grants are only awarded to those organisations who operate within our beneficial area of Northumberland, Tyne and Wear, Tees Valley, North Yorkshire and Cumbria. We do not award grants to individuals.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £271,189
Total expenditure: £268,281

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria
  • Durham
  • Gateshead
  • Middlesbrough
  • Newcastle Upon Tyne City
  • North Tyneside
  • Northumberland
  • North Yorkshire
  • Redcar And Cleveland
  • South Tyneside

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 December 1966: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE ROYAL VICTORIA SCHOOL FOR THE BLIND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANN MARGARET RUDDICK Chair
THE ROYAL VICTORIA TRUST FOR THE BLIND
Recently registered
Jack Moffat Trustee 11 October 2024
NORTHUMBERLAND COUNTY BLIND ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
June Christine Gowland Trustee 12 January 2024
THE ROYAL VICTORIA TRUST FOR THE BLIND
Recently registered
Karen Anne Hannah Trustee 03 February 2020
THE ROYAL VICTORIA TRUST FOR THE BLIND
Recently registered
Sheridan Dixon Trustee 09 November 2018
BEDE METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: 22 days late
THE ROYAL VICTORIA TRUST FOR THE BLIND
Recently registered
Angus Robert Huntley Trustee 09 November 2018
THE ROYAL VICTORIA TRUST FOR THE BLIND
Recently registered
Paul John Edward Smith Trustee 17 March 2017
THE ROYAL VICTORIA TRUST FOR THE BLIND
Recently registered
Susan Rosemary Gregg Trustee 17 March 2017
THE SUNDERLAND AND NORTH DURHAM ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND
Received: 40 days late
THE ROYAL VICTORIA TRUST FOR THE BLIND
Recently registered
RICHARD MARTIN WOOD Trustee 31 January 2014
THE ROYAL VICTORIA TRUST FOR THE BLIND
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £338.23k £189.99k £49.82k £99.57k £271.19k
Total expenditure £313.42k £203.16k £60.13k £93.87k £268.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 21 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 11 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Royal Victoria Trust for the Blind
PO Box 920
Whitley Bay
NE26 9FP
Phone:
07554 166385
Website:

not.applicable