MARGARET MOORE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational grants in the Parish of Whalton, Northumberland
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Northumberland
Governance
- 08 November 1965: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLES ERRINGTON | Trustee | 12 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY NORTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6 | £2 | £63 | £87 | £96 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £60 | £80 | £80 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 November 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 15TH JANUARY 1906 AS VARIED BY SCHEME DATED 20TH JULY 1928
Charitable objects
TO BE APPLIED IN EITHER OR BOTH OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS (A) PAYMENT OF FEES TRAVELLING EXPENSES OR MAINTENANC ALLOWANCES FOR THE PURPOSES OF EDUCATION OTHER THANT ELEMENTARY FOR BOYS OR GIRLS OF THE PARISH WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE; (B) OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION, INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING OF BOYS AND GIRLS OF THE POOER CLASSES IN THE PARISH
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WHALTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ogle Flatts Farm
Ogle
Ponteland
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE20 0AX
- Phone:
- 01670775388
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window