PAROCHIAL SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Receipt of investment income
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Northumberland
Governance
- 26 May 1965: Standard registration
- THE MARKWELL CHARITY FOR THE PAROCHIAL SCHOOL HOLY ISLAND (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Faith Nichola Brennan | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
MARK RICHARD FLEESON | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Sarah Ann Hills | Trustee | 20 January 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Jane Crossman | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|||||||||
ELIZABETH THELMA DUNNE | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
RALPH WILSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33 | £34 | £35 | £36 | £37 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 September 2024 | 319 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 September 2024 | 684 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 February 2022 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 February 2022 | 470 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 24 JANUARY 1871
Charitable objects
A SCHOOL FOR THE INSTRUCTION OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS, OR CHILDREN ONLY OF THE LABOURING, MANUFACTURING AND OTHER POORER CLASSES.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HOLY ISLAND
Linked charities
- 26 May 1965 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE VICARAGE
HOLY ISLAND
BERWICK-UPON-TWEED
TD15 2RX
- Phone:
- 01289389216
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window