NINEBANKS SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants to students in full time education living in the Ninebanks area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Northumberland
Governance
- 04 November 1983: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Sutterby | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Martin | Trustee | 30 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAUL HICKEY | Trustee | 29 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARINA WALLACE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MS JENNY HAMMOND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOROTHY SUMMERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.98k | £1.88k | £1.88k | £2.22k | £2.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.05k | £1.80k | £1.45k | £1.50k | £1.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 May 2024 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 4 NOVEMBER 1983
Charitable objects
(A) IN PROVIDING FOR ANY SCHOOL IN THE AREA BENEFITS NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LEA. (B) IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION, INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING OF PERSONS IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE WHO ARE OR WHO HAVE A PARENT RESIDENT IN THE AREA.
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF FORMER COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL AT NINEBANKS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Low House
Ninebanks
Hexham
NE47 8HJ
- Phone:
- 01434345653
- Email:
- hickey57@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window