THE ALL SAINTS SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This trust fund is used for young people aged between 16-18 who have completed GCSE courses and wish to continue their education in the sixth form and would like assistance in furthering their education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 11 December 1963: Standard registration
- 02 March 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £132 | £160 | £181 | £250 | £14 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 21 December 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 19 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 27 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 22 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 09 August 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 8TH SEPTEMBER 1908
Charitable objects
IN AIDING BY MEANS OF SCHOLARSHIPS THE HIGHER EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OR YOUNG PERSONS WHO HAVE ATTENDED PUBLIC ELMENTARY SCHOOLS.
Area of benefit
CITY OF NOTTINGHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window